Financial history OXFORDSHIRE OESOPHAGEAL AND STOMACH ORGANISATION

Charity number: 1152733
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £33.82k £34.02k £14.92k £19.79k £40.27k
Total expenditure £29.13k £26.15k £27.18k £26.20k £19.79k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A