Trustees WEST DOWN VILLAGE GREEN FIELD ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1153245
Charity reporting is up to date (1 day late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JOHN STAINER Chair 25 July 2013
None on record
Christopher Batstone Trustee 27 February 2023
None on record
Ben Nias Trustee 27 February 2023
None on record
Michael Hunt Trustee 28 February 2022
None on record
Benjamin Hookes Trustee 28 May 2020
None on record
Susi Batstone Trustee 26 February 2019
None on record
CAROLE KING Trustee 25 July 2013
None on record
ERNEST KEITH OADES Trustee 25 July 2013
WEST DOWN PARISH HALL
Received: On time
THE ROTARY CLUB OF BRAUNTON TRUST FUND
Received: 2 days late
BRAUNTON VOLUNTEERS
Received: On time