ICARE AND EDUCATION FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We help under-served children and youth learn skills and dispositions that make them Future-Ready (addressing employability in the fast-changing 21st-century) and Life-Ready (health, well-being, and joyful living), in fun and innovative ways.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
- India
Governance
- 24 November 2013: Standard registration
- 25 October 2022: Removed (Does not operate)
- Timeless Lifeskills Foundation (Working name)
- ICARE AND EDUCATION FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- TIMELESS LIFESKILLS FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £1.51k | £2.45k | £5.43k | £70 | |
|
Total expenditure | £25 | £50 | £75 | £50 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 February 2021 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 31 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 11 JUN 2013 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 24 OCT 2013 AS AMENDED ON 17 JAN 2019 AS AMENDED ON 11 MAR 2019
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF SUFFERERS OF EYE CONDITIONS IN INDIA THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND SUPPORT.TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SUBJECT OF EYE CARE BY THE PROVISION OF E-LEARNING TUTORIALS,ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window