1248 Langton Association

Charity number: 1156195
Charity reporting is overdue by 269 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Total gross income £16.95k £16.07k £13.08k £10.08k £7.62k
Total expenditure £18.37k £13.36k £623 £616 £1.08k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A