Financial history DENBY DALE COMMUNITY PROJECT

Charity number: 1155111
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £13.58k £12.39k £15.02k £22.87k £12.89k
Total expenditure £11.06k £7.80k £16.39k £14.89k £5.78k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £10.00k N/A £19.43k £8.00k