Trustees DENBY DALE COMMUNITY PROJECT

Charity number: 1155111
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JANET SUSAN JOHNSON Chair 24 October 2018
None on record
Tansy Hepton Trustee 30 September 2019
None on record
Kath Kerr Trustee 01 July 2019
None on record
Derek John Lawrence Trustee 01 July 2019
None on record
Susan Margaret Daniels MA Trustee 08 February 2017
None on record
DR Neil Denby FHEA Trustee 08 February 2017
None on record
Jonathan Edward Milner Trustee 09 January 2017
None on record
Katherine Tunstall Trustee 05 January 2015
None on record
LINDA MARY KITSON BA Trustee 30 September 2014
None on record
PETER JOHN BELSEY Trustee 13 December 2013
None on record