Financial history CITY CHURCH PRESTON

Charity number: 1153061
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £63.05k £96.35k £43.17k £43.11k £55.88k
Total expenditure £83.09k £63.88k £68.15k £48.35k £65.84k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £540 N/A