Accounts and annual returns Care For Survivors

Charity number: 1154016
Charity reporting is overdue by 87 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 Overdue Overdue by 87 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Overdue Overdue by 87 days
Annual return 31 August 2020 11 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 11 May 2021 315 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 27 October 2020 119 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 11 May 2021 681 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 27 October 2020 485 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2017 02 August 2018 33 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 02 August 2018 33 days late Download Open in new window