Financial history Care For Survivors

Charity number: 1154016
Charity reporting is overdue by 92 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £958.01k £499.79k £38.10k £0 £0
Total expenditure £833.10k £520.49k £64.24k £37.95k £4.13k
Income from government contracts £354.02k £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £603.71k £499.28k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £957.99k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £11 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £957.99k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £833.10k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £833.10k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A