HOLLINS AND UNSWORTH COMMUNITY CENTRE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 503881
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 02 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 29 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 19 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 18 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 07 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required