Friends of Oakleaf Primary

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Parent Teacher Association of Oakleaf Primary - (previously known as Chaulden Infants and Chaulden Junior Schools) Hemel Hempstead, Hertfordshire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 25 June 2013: Standard registration
- CHAULDEN JUNIORS PTA (Previous name)
- FRIENDS OF CHAULDEN JUNIOR SCHOOL (Previous name)
- Friends of Chaulden Schools (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEPHANIE HOLLOWAY | Chair | 17 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Hayley Pearce | Trustee | 16 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alan Scott | Trustee | 16 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hayley Stockwell | Trustee | 16 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Pollard | Trustee | 11 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
CLARE SEAR | Trustee | 17 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Elizabeth Gurney | Trustee | 17 September 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.46k | £5.93k | £2.55k | £7.69k | £4.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.02k | £5.91k | £5.59k | £6.98k | £4.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 03 October 2024 | 95 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 11 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 19 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 07 July 2020 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29 JAN 2013 AS AMENDED ON 09 OCT 2017 as amended on 22 May 2023 as amended on 06 Nov 2024
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: 1) DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; 2) ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Oakleaf Primary School
School Row
HEMEL HEMPSTEAD
HP1 2JU
- Phone:
- 01442395758
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window