THE FRIENDS OF HALESWORTH COUNTY LIBRARY

Charity number: 1153765
Charity reporting is up to date (2 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £10.68k £11.77k £17.45k £16.87k £12.95k
Total expenditure £18.77k £3.23k £15.28k £2.84k £6.48k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £3.25k £3.00k £3.00k £3.00k