Financial history MAMA MADINO FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1156878
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 11/03/2018 11/03/2019 11/03/2020 11/03/2021 11/03/2022
Total gross income £4.80k £800 £9.00k £2.50k £3.40k
Total expenditure £4.70k £80 £8.40k £2.30k £3.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A