THE PROSPERITY'S CHURCH OF JESUS CHRIST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious support and activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
16 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Belgium
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
- France
- Germany
- Ghana
- Italy
- Netherlands
Governance
- 25 November 2013: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOSEPH ABRAHAM MASUKULU - KIESSE | Chair | 19 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
RUTH LILAMU | Trustee | 30 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
MONIQUE MAKULUWANI | Trustee | 25 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
SARA ESENGO MASUKULU | Trustee | 25 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
LUWAWU NDOMBASI | Trustee | 25 November 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £79.67k | £41.85k | £41.85k | £23.21k | £43.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £77.89k | £44.33k | £44.33k | £23.22k | £43.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 August 2024 | 196 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 14 August 2024 | 561 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 02 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 September 2021 | 213 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2020
(These accounts |
01 September 2021 | 213 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01/04/2013 AS AMENDED ON 18/10/2013
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECT (THE OBJECT) IS THE PROMOTION OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH THROUGH WORSHIP, TEACHING AND ASSOCIATED RELIGIOUS SERVICES AND ACTIVITIES, INCLUDING THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AMONGST CHURCH MEMBERS AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC, ESPECIALLY, IN THE UNITED KINGDOM BUT ALSO IN OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DECIDE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
96 LEA FARM DRIVE
LEEDS
LS5 3QH
- Phone:
- 01132786035
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window