Financial history HUMAN APPEAL

Charity number: 1154288
Regulatory alert
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £44.20m £23.16m £19.39m £29.68m £35.52m
Total expenditure £40.72m £29.69m £21.37m £26.04m £31.52m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £322.43k £32.10k
Income - Donations and legacies £36.92m £14.63m £14.22m £24.09m £32.64m
Income - Other trading activities £71.63k £125.45k £48.86k £30 £30.75k
Income - Charitable activities £7.22m £8.38m £5.09m £5.23m £2.77m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £43.19k £17.39k £30.11k £63.26k £42.03k
Income - Other -£54.26k £12.28k £0 £293.48k £32.11k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £31.55m £24.77m £15.83m £18.79m £22.62m
Expenditure - Raising funds £8.46m £4.80m £5.36m £7.25m £8.65m
Expenditure - Governance £284.46k £376.75k £0 £0 £490.06k
Expenditure - Grants institution £4.62m £0 £2.40m £4.06m £5.40m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £707.47k £121.23k £176.36k £0 £246.54k