WHITCHURCH FOODBANK

Charity number: 1153274
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 19 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 19 March 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 16 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 20 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 03 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 29 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required