CONSORTIUM FOR CHILDREN AND FAMILIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supports and represents community nurseries in Sheffield. Works in partnership to develop opportunities to meet the needs of children and families in deprived area's of Sheffield.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 30 August 2013: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gail Johnson | Trustee | 26 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sharon Curtis | Trustee | 10 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Claire Ward | Trustee | 26 May 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 91 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 91 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 457 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 457 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 21 March 2023 | 49 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 February 2021 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 March 2021 | 53 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 30 Aug 2013
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO(“THE OBJECTS”) ARE TO PROMOTE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVENESS IN THE CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES OF NOT-FOR-PROFIT ORGANISATIONS, VOLUNTARY GROUPS AND CHARITIES AND IN PARTICULAR THOSE OPERATING IN THE FIELD OF CHILDCARE AND EARLY YEARS EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN THE CITY OF SHEFFIELD AND ELSEWHERE, PROVIDED THAT IN THE OBJECTS, (I) "VOLUNTARY SECTOR" IS DEFINED AS CHARITIES AND VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS (II) “CHARITIES” ARE ORGANISATIONS, WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES (III) “VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS” ARE INDEPENDENT ORGANISATIONS WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR PURPOSES THAT ADD VALUE TO THE COMMUNITY AS A WHOLE, OR A SIGNIFICANT SECTION OF THE COMMUNITY, AND WHICH ARE NOT PERMITTED BY THEIR CONSTITUTION TO MAKE A PROFIT FOR PRIVATE DISTRIBUTION. VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS DO NOT INCLUDE LOCAL GOVERNMENT OR OTHER STATUTORY ORGANISATIONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Manor Community Childcare Centre Lt
33 Vikinglea Road
SHEFFIELD
S2 1BE
- Phone:
- 01142642594
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window