ATHERTON & LEIGH FOODBANK

Charity number: 1153333
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 13 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 13 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 28 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 19 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 23 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 23 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 20 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 20 September 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 17 June 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 17 June 2016 On time
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)