ATHERTON & LEIGH FOODBANK

Charity number: 1153333
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £28.46k £25.57k £11.44k N/A N/A
Other income £23.70k £13.55k £19.95k £32.20k £44.83k
Total expenditure £34.06k £35.80k £39.31k £50.22k £54.31k