BASFORD, BESTWOOD & BULWELL FOODBANK

Charity number: 1153963
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £15.29k £14.38k £12.02k £9.95k £14.61k
Total expenditure £16.57k £15.56k £15.83k £16.55k £17.39k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A