Accounts and annual returns CAMBRIDGE LITERARY FESTIVAL

Charity number: 1153944
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 12 April 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 12 April 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 08 June 2021 39 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 08 June 2021 39 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2019 06 May 2020 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 06 May 2020 6 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2018 26 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 26 March 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2017 27 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

27 March 2018 On time Download Open in new window