Financial history CAMBRIDGE LITERARY FESTIVAL

Charity number: 1153944
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £250.87k £412.69k £370.92k £308.36k £238.79k
Total expenditure £221.99k £401.29k £397.85k £256.96k £255.22k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.00k N/A N/A N/A £50.00k