Trustees CAMBRIDGE LITERARY FESTIVAL
Charity number: 1153944

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JEREMY HENRY MOORE NEWSUM | Chair | 26 July 2017 |
|
|||||
Anna Lawlor | Trustee | 28 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Eleanor Birne | Trustee | 24 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Henry Theodore Elliot | Trustee | 08 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Katie Taylor | Trustee | 25 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
KAREN DUFFY | Trustee | 18 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
JULIA COLLINS | Trustee | 20 July 2016 |
|
|||||
MS Sian Reid | Trustee | 10 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
PETER TAYLOR | Trustee | 17 July 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.