Financial history ST JOSEPH'S PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1153598
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £126.65k £140.74k £148.63k £145.11k £162.38k
Total expenditure £123.09k £139.10k £143.75k £142.97k £149.55k
Income from government contracts £107.66k £120.33k N/A £119.41k £140.21k
Income from government grants £6.56k £5.43k N/A £1.21k £5.32k