ST JOSEPH'S PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1153598
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Theresa Hall Trustee 25 June 2019 None on record
Haydn Cartwright Trustee 11 February 2020 None on record
Mary Hague Trustee 17 October 2016 None on record
Rachel Lewis Trustee 16 January 2017 None on record
Anthony Joseph Parkes Trustee 19 April 2020 None on record
Mary Elizabeth Parkes Trustee 19 April 2020 None on record
Mary Anne Taremekedzwa Manjoro Trustee 01 September 2017 None on record