ASTON VILLA FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To pay or apply the funds of the organisation to such bodies and/or to such charitable purpose which are exclusively charitabel in law and in such proportions and manner and subject to such terms and conditions as the directors may in their uncontrolled discretion determine.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income:
£3,271,632
Donations and legacies | £149.46k | |
Charitable activities | £3.12m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£3,028,222
Raising funds | £71.78k | |
Charitable activities | £2.96m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £146,730 from 2 government contract(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £71.78k | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.96m | |
Retained for future use | £243.41k |
People

87 Employee(s)
6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
£120k to £130k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Birmingham City
- Coventry City
- Dudley
- Sandwell
- Solihull
- Staffordshire
- Walsall
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 12 July 2013: Standard registration
- VILLA IN THE COMMUNITY (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ben Hatton | Trustee | 07 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Stevens | Trustee | 07 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Helen Wilkes | Trustee | 25 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Colville | Trustee | 22 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Pavlou | Trustee | 28 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
PRITESH PATTNI | Trustee | 14 October 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.60m | £1.56m | £2.38m | £2.70m | £3.27m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.36m | £1.51m | £1.89m | £2.45m | £3.03m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £128.50k | £36.23k | £146.73k | |
|
Income from government grants | £24.00k | £54.13k | £67.55k | £74.50k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £143.40k | £159.19k | £169.09k | £141.70k | £149.46k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.45m | £1.40m | £2.21m | £2.56m | £3.12m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.33m | £1.48m | £1.86m | £2.41m | £2.96m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £31.54k | £30.23k | £30.26k | £34.42k | £71.78k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £0 | £0 | £15.06k | £17.80k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £1.00k | £100 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £21.28k | £10.64k | £2 | £1 | £1 | |
|
Long-term investments | £1 | £0 | £0 | £1 | £1 | |
|
Other assets | £1.35m | £1.30m | £1.86m | £2.26m | £2.28m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £203.62k | £86.02k | £141.62k | £283.37k | £68.98k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 26 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 26 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 20 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 20 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 31 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 31 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 31 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 31 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 31 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 31 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 28/06/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02/07/2013 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 16/10/2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22 NOV 2017
Charitable objects
3.1 TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF FOOTBALL AND OTHER SPORTS CAPABLE OF IMPROVING HEALTH (FACILITIES IN THIS ARTICLE MEANS LAND, BUILDINGS, EQUIPMENT AND ORGANISING SPORTING ACTIVITIES); 3.2 TO PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR SPORT, RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF SUCH PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED FOR SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, GENDER, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; 3.3 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING ACADEMIC, SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL) OF CHILDREN, YOUNG PEOPLE AND ADULTS TO PROVIDE OPPORTUNITIES FOR THEM TO DEVELOP THEIR FULL CAPACITIES AND ENABLE THEM TO BECOME RESPONSIBLE MEMBERS OF SOCIETY SO THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED; AND 3.4 TO PAY OR APPLY THE FUNDS OF THE CHARITY TO SUCH BODIES AND/OR TO SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE IN LAW AND IN SUCH PROPORTIONS IN SUCH MANNER AND SUBJECT TO SUCH TERMS
Contact information
- Address:
-
ASTON VILLA FOOTBALL CLUB PLC
TRINITY ROAD
BIRMINGHAM
B6 6HE
- Phone:
- 01213272299
- Email:
- foundation@avfc.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.