I Human Foundation

Charity number: 1156487
Charity reporting is up to date (151 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 01 July 2021 151 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 01 July 2021 151 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 05 March 2020 34 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 18 June 2020 139 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 03 January 2020 337 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 18 June 2020 504 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 05 April 2019 429 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 18 June 2020 869 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 05 April 2019 794 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 18 June 2020 1234 days late Download