Financial history CELTIC HARMONY

Charity number: 1156199
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £326.29k £287.16k £463.80k £304.75k £397.50k
Total expenditure £222.06k £252.11k £330.31k £323.80k £328.13k
Income from government contracts £36.64k £9.32k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £16.07k £2.33k £96.78k £129.04k