LEARN ENGLISH AT HOME

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
LEAH works with asylum seekers, refugees and migrants who are socially isolated due to their lack of English language. Our volunteer-led service provides one to one English language tuition face to face or online; small group classes in the community or online; trips and social activities; health and welling being support; and education, employment and volunteering progression support
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £28,000 from 2 government contract(s) and £10,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
130 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 15 August 2013: CIO registration
- 10 April 2014: Funds received from 1057008 LEARN ENGLISH AT HOME
- LEARN-ENGLISH AT HOME (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sharon Landa | Chair | 12 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Davies | Trustee | 23 February 2023 |
|
|||||
Harbinda Hanspal | Trustee | 12 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Thomas | Trustee | 12 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Close | Trustee | 14 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Harprit Sekhon | Trustee | 12 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Audrey Francon | Trustee | 08 January 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £396.50k | £335.10k | £426.69k | £380.14k | £294.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £321.04k | £280.89k | £308.65k | £372.59k | £386.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £18.00k | £23.45k | £23.33k | £25.00k | £28.00k | |
|
Income from government grants | £157.80k | £11.43k | £16.69k | £5.00k | £10.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 25 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 25 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 08 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 14 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 15 AUG 2013 AMENDED ON 14/12/2015 as amended on 13 May 2020 as amended on 13 Mar 2025
Charitable objects
The objects of the CIO are, for the public benefit: to advance the education and integration of asylum seekers, refugees and migrants who do not speak English as a first language, improving their access to support services and future education, employment and volunteering opportunities; and to further such other charitable purposes according to the law of England and Wales as the trustees see fit.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Siddeley House
50 Canbury Park Road
Kingston
Surrey
KT26LX
- Phone:
- 02082556144
- Email:
- info@leah.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window