BASINGSTOKE FOODBANK

Charity number: 1154319
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 22 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 22 July 2021 On time
Annual return 30 September 2019 23 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 23 May 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2018 01 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 01 July 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2017 08 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 08 March 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2016 29 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 29 July 2017 On time Download