Accounts and annual returns COMUNIDAD DE LA DIVINA MISERICORDIA

Charity number: 1153405
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 01 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 01 October 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 25 March 2022 53 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 25 March 2022 53 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 28 May 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 14 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 14 July 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 16 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 16 September 2018 On time Download Open in new window