Financial history COMUNIDAD DE LA DIVINA MISERICORDIA

Charity number: 1153405
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £7.65k £9.58k £6.02k £4.42k £8.25k
Total expenditure £8.51k £9.89k £5.41k £2.44k £9.84k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A