AL-JAWAD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. THE RELIEF OF NEED OF THE POOR IN INDIA, PAKISTAN AND IRAQ BY: (I) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION (II) THE PROMOTION OF HEALTH BY ASSISTING IN MEDICAL TREATMENT AND CARE AND THROUGH THE PROVISION OF MEDICAL SUPPLIES
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 October 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
- India
- Iraq
- Pakistan
Governance
- 30 October 2013: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MIRZA MOHAMMED JAWAD | Chair | 10 July 2013 |
|
|||||
Tahira Batool | Trustee | 22 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
MRS NABEELAH BATOOL | Trustee | 10 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
S BATOOL | Trustee | 10 July 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/10/2019 | 29/10/2020 | 29/10/2021 | 29/10/2022 | 29/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £44.75k | £54.11k | £51.67k | £41.80k | £44.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £40.07k | £47.51k | £53.56k | £48.44k | £40.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 October 2023 | 29 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 October 2023 | 29 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 October 2022 | 01 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 October 2022 | 01 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 October 2021 | 04 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 October 2021 | 04 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 October 2020 | 14 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 October 2020 | 14 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 October 2019 | 28 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 October 2019 | 28 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 23/10/2013 as amended on 24 Oct 2021
Charitable objects
1. THE RELIEF OF NEED OF THE POOR IN INDIA, PAKISTAN AND IRAQ BY: (I) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GRANTS TO ENABLE CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN PARTICULAR TO ACCESS EDUCATIONAL OPPORTUNITIES. (II) THE PROMOTION OF HEALTH BY ASSISTING IN MEDICAL TREATMENT AND CARE AND THROUGH THE PROVISION OF MEDICAL SUPPLIES. 2. THE PROMOTION OF RELIGIOUS HARMONY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY PROMOTING KNOWLEDGE AND MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING AND RESPECT OF THE BELIEFS AND PRACTICES OF DIFFERENT RELIGIOUS FAITHS. 3. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ISLAMIC RELIGION IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS BY: HOLDING EDUCATIONAL EVENTS AND LECTURES TO PROMOTE PEACEFUL VALUES OF ISLAM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 12
Brandan House
Sovereign Place
HARROW
HA1 2FN
- Phone:
- 07862296910
- Email:
- mmjawad2000000@yahoo.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window