WELSH INSTITUTE FOR WOMEN'S HEALTH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity facilitates educational activities in the field of women's health. The educational meetings are usually attended by specialty doctors, nurses, midwives, fertility specialties, health care managers and senior specialists. The Charity promotes education through the award of bursaries.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 08 January 2014: CIO registration
- WIWH (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr RICHARD JOHN ANDERSON PENKETH MD FRCOG | Chair | 28 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
JACQUELINE LOUISE SCOTT DRCOG | Trustee | 28 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
SARAH CATHERINE FOX BSC MSC | Trustee | 28 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
Professor NAZAR NAJIB AMSO PHD, FRCOG | Trustee | 28 August 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.46k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.12k | £2.00k | £0 | £357 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 04 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 04 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 29 March 2022 | 52 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 29 March 2022 | 52 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 04 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 04 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 08 Jan 2014
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND PROMOTE AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY: (A) THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING TO THE PUBLIC AND HEALTHCARE PROFESSIONALS IN ALL ASPECTS OF HEALTH CARE RELATED TO WOMEN; (B) THE PROMOTION AND SUPPORT OF PROFESSIONAL STANDARDS, VALUES AND INTERESTS; AND (C) THE DISSEMINATION OF KNOWLEDGE AND GOOD PRACTICE IN THE FIELD OF WOMEN'S HEALTH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ground Floor
2A Oak Tree Court
Mulberry Drive
Cardiff Gate Business Park
Cardiff
CF23 8RS
- Phone:
- 07434768143
- Email:
- wiwh.charity@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window