NEWDAY UNITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the CIO, for the public benefit, is the prevention and/or relief of poverty in particular by (but not limited to) the provision of financial assistance, resources and other support to individuals in poverty principally (but not exclusively) in Africa.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- South Africa
Governance
- 26 November 2013: CIO registration
- 08 December 2021: Funds received from 1001717 HOPE CHURCH, RAYLEIGH
- NEWDAY UK (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
EDWARD AMIES | Chair | 15 October 2013 |
|
|||||
Michael Bryn Davies | Trustee | 25 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Michael Ledger | Trustee | 25 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Shelley Maxceen Dongella Collins | Trustee | 28 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
LYNN JANICE SWART | Trustee | 15 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
JAMES PETER JACKSON BA HONS | Trustee | 15 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER JANE JACKSON MA HONS | Trustee | 15 October 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £98.85k | £146.00k | £116.66k | £139.11k | £145.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £93.34k | £105.77k | £93.49k | £136.59k | £138.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 18 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 08 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 04 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 26 Nov 2013
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IS THE PREVENTION AND/OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN PARTICULAR BY (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, RESOURCES AND OTHER SUPPORT TO INDIVIDUALS IN POVERTY PRINCIPALLY (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) IN AFRICA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
NEWDAY UNITED (REGISTERED OFFICE)
Percy Westhead & Company
Hanover House
30-32 Charlotte Street
MANCHESTER
M1 4FD
- Phone:
- 07837180515
- Email:
- info@newdayunited.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window