Trustees AYSCOUGHFEE HALL SCHOOL PTFA
Charity Number: 1152867

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Leanne Kerry Godderidge | Chair | 27 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Abbe Boland | Trustee | 16 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Holly Ann Longstaff | Trustee | 26 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sandie Hutchinson | Trustee | 15 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ali Phiri | Trustee | 02 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jason Paul Bingham | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Louise Jeffries | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Theresa Wright | Trustee | 27 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Katy Luff | Trustee | 22 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kelly Crawford | Trustee | 22 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
James Clark | Trustee | 19 September 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.