Trustees THE WEST LONDON SYNAGOGUE OF BRITISH JEWS
Charity number: 1155821

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDREW STONE | Chair | 13 June 2017 |
|
|||||
Antony Pierre | Trustee | 31 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Corb | Trustee | 20 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Weiss | Trustee | 20 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gary Ian Skovron | Trustee | 20 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Beatrix Jacqueline Landau | Trustee | 20 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sam Elliot Goodman | Trustee | 20 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP JEREMY BARD | Trustee | 20 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Anna Jean Strang | Trustee | 31 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Monica Jankel | Trustee | 18 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Lenka Talya Kohli | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Vivien Sophia Feather | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Remy Michelle Maisel | Trustee | 22 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Flora Pollecoff | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|||||
Alison Olivia Edelshain | Trustee | 17 June 2020 |
|
|||||
Bradley Louis Altberger | Trustee | 17 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Richard Malcolm Slowe | Trustee | 23 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Scott Gasperow | Trustee | 26 June 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.