WILD ACRE RESCUE

Charity number: 1153315
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £118.78k £90.11k £86.65k £113.25k £158.38k
Total expenditure £112.66k £95.68k £85.11k £121.30k £118.13k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £30.00k