Accounts and annual returns DERCUMS DISEASE & RARE DISEASE FOUNDATION UK

Charity number: 1154613
Charity reporting is overdue by 1688 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2023 Overdue Overdue by 227 days
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2023 Overdue Overdue by 227 days
Annual return 31 January 2022 Overdue Overdue by 592 days
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 Overdue Overdue by 592 days
Annual return 31 January 2021 Overdue Overdue by 957 days
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 Overdue Overdue by 957 days
Annual return 31 January 2020 Overdue Overdue by 1322 days
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Overdue Overdue by 1322 days
Annual return 31 January 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1688 days
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1688 days