EAST GRINSTEAD FOODBANK

Charity number: 1154256
Charity reporting is up to date (47 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2019 16 November 2020 47 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 16 November 2020 47 days late Download
Annual return 30 November 2018 05 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2018 05 July 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 November 2017 14 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2016 13 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2016 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2015 15 July 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2015 Not Required