EAST GRINSTEAD FOODBANK

Charity number: 1154256
Charity reporting is up to date (47 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
30/11/2015 30/11/2016 30/11/2017 30/11/2018 30/11/2019
Total gross income £24.09k £23.56k £22.08k £44.18k £34.30k
Total expenditure £11.77k £27.51k £29.13k £27.42k £29.20k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £7.50k £7.00k £7.00k £5.00k £5.35k