MACCLESFIELD COMMUNITY ARTSPACE

Charity number: 1153606
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £23.16k £66.61k £45.61k £31.07k £20.38k
Total expenditure £22.27k £44.59k £57.94k £42.70k £18.83k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.00k £6.84k £1.60k N/A £10.85k