BROMLEY CHILDREN AND FAMILIES VOLUNTARY SECTOR FORUM

Charity number: 1153545
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 25 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 25 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 06 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 06 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 13 June 2019 133 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 13 June 2019 133 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 12 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

12 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 13 July 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 13 July 2016 On time Download