Financial history BROMLEY CHILDREN AND FAMILIES VOLUNTARY SECTOR FORUM

Charity number: 1153545
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £9.34k £4.70k £1.55k £10.76k £40.62k
Total expenditure £12.29k £4.05k £2.97k £5.22k £19.48k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £29.15k