BROMLEY CHILDREN AND FAMILIES VOLUNTARY SECTOR FORUM

Charity number: 1153545
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Philippa Wendy Rastall-Phillips Trustee 29 July 2020 None on record
Barry David McDonald Trustee 28 October 2020 None on record
HELEN DYER Chair 16 July 2013 None on record
PAUL COSGRAVE Trustee 12 June 2014
COMMUNITY LINKS BROMLEY Received: On time
Jennifer Mapakou Trustee 27 March 2020
LAY WITNESSES FOR CHRIST INTERNATIONAL - UNITED KINGDOM Received: 17 days late