THE FRIENDS OF GUISBOROUGH FOREST & WALKWAY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote and improve educational and recreational facilities and resources at the sites known as 'Guisborough Forest and Walkway'. To encourage use of the countryside by as wide a spectrum of people as possible. We help manage the sites in a way that will conserve and enhance their natural and industrial heritage. We actively fundraise with all monies going towards achieving the above goals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Redcar And Cleveland
Governance
- 11 December 2013: Standard registration
- FOGFW (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Penny Walkley | Trustee | 23 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Michael Robson | Trustee | 25 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Rosemarie Bell | Trustee | 20 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Sue Harrison | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Norma Thirkell | Trustee | 30 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Michael Kilby | Trustee | 06 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
MR MIKE JOHNSON | Trustee | 05 August 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.81k | £1.59k | £23.96k | £23.38k | £19.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £39.56k | £6.05k | £21.36k | £18.99k | £31.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 08 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 24 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 24 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 MAY 2013 AS AMENDED ON 15/11/2013
Charitable objects
1. TO ASSIST IN THE CONSERVATION AND PRESERVATION OF THE AREA KNOWN AS GUISBOROUGH FOREST AND WALKWAY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT. 2. TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Visitor Centre
Guisborough Forest & Walkway
Pinchinthorpe
Guisborough
Cleveland
TS14 8HD
- Phone:
- 01287633503
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.