Accounts and annual returns MERSEYSIDE COUNTY SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 503957
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2021 01 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 01 December 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 29 February 2020 28 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 28 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2019 13 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 13 November 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2018 01 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2018 01 November 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2017 13 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2017 13 December 2017 On time Download Open in new window