MERSEYSIDE COUNTY SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 503957
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 28/02/2016 28/02/2017 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020
Total gross income £446.75k £280.77k £343.88k £403.40k £383.72k
Total expenditure £362.26k £236.35k £276.62k £346.57k £360.94k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A