Trustees MERSEYSIDE COUNTY SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 503957
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

17 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David Steer QC DL Chair 13 January 2018
None on record
Andrew Pickersgill Trustee 23 September 2021
None on record
Calum Towers Trustee 23 September 2021
None on record
James Rory Barber Trustee 24 September 2020
None on record
Alexandra Frances Clark Trustee 26 September 2019
SEFTON NORTH DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL
Received: On time
Nichola Amanda Parr Trustee 26 September 2019
None on record
Kieran Thomas Murphy Trustee 26 September 2019
None on record
Jane Rosemary Owen Trustee 28 September 2017
None on record
Daragh O'Malley Trustee 28 September 2017
None on record
NIGEL ERNEST MACLEOD Trustee 28 September 2017
None on record
William John Cadman Trustee 06 October 2016
None on record
John Charles Drysdale Trustee 01 October 2015
None on record
MR SAM ROBINSON Trustee 30 September 2010
1ST SOUTHPORT (AINSDALE) SCOUT GROUP
Received: On time
SEFTON NORTH DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL
Received: On time
Peter Daniel Oliver Trustee
THE SCOUT ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
THE CORNERSTONES FOUNDATION
Received: On time
MR MIKE HUSSEY Trustee
None on record
MARK BENNETT Trustee
None on record
ALAN JAMES SEELEY Trustee
None on record