MICKLEOVER COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1155537
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £44.45k £44.20k £55.38k £47.35k £70.18k
Total expenditure £44.53k £46.92k £50.37k £53.94k £70.88k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £7.84k